THE UNDERGROUND TRAINING STATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 August 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 05 August 2019 6 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late Download