OTTERY ST MARY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1165093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 July 2017 On time Download