OTTERY ST MARY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1165093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £45.89k £57.54k £47.88k £55.91k £70.59k
Total expenditure £41.46k £70.36k £35.89k £84.67k £71.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A