Accounts and annual returns BACK ON TRACK

Charity number: 1169764
Charity reporting is up to date (152 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 July 2022 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 July 2022 152 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 March 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 10 March 2020 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window