Accounts and annual returns ISLE OF AXHOLME PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED SOCIETY

Charity number: 507271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required