Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, LAPWORTH

Charity number: 1165322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £100.84k £115.14k £87.84k £106.57k £92.74k
Total expenditure £145.63k £99.59k £96.72k £80.01k £96.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £1.50k N/A N/A N/A