Financial history ROEHAMPTON PARISH TRUST

Charity number: 1165257
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £68.42k £56.04k £56.32k £50.84k £50.75k
Total expenditure £42.30k £126.51k £103.06k £168.97k £81.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A