UFFORD COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1171424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2019 278 days late Download