Accounts and annual returns THE CYNARA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window