24TH BIRMINGHAM MANOR FARM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 507303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.95k £14.68k £15.70k £10.91k £24.08k
Total expenditure £14.11k £12.98k £17.19k £13.42k £10.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.80k £7.80k £7.80k £7.80k £21.74k