Accounts and annual returns EBENEZER CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1166186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 May 2021 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 May 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window