Financial history EBENEZER CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1166186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £28.82k £24.49k £24.88k £19.29k £10.84k
Total expenditure £11.32k £9.44k £10.96k £12.19k £9.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A