Financial history CASTON VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1164836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £30.01k £13.60k £19.55k £27.51k £29.85k
Total expenditure £6.79k £8.95k £14.97k £20.93k £5.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k N/A N/A £20.68k N/A