ST JOHN'S CHURCH PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1164822
Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 61 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 61 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 15 December 2020 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 15 December 2020 76 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 27 November 2019 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 27 November 2019 58 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 09 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 09 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 12 March 2018 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 11 March 2018 162 days late Download