Financial history UK GUAN YIN CITTA DHARMA DOOR BUDDHIST CHARITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.36k £17.39k £32.83k £31.96k £42.55k
Total expenditure £5.38k £8.27k £34.38k £36.73k £34.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A