Financial history DARLASTON NATIONAL SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1164892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.87k £7.05k £8.14k £2.62k £2.91k
Total expenditure £7.08k £7.17k £6.91k £4.30k £3.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A