STOKESLEY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 507339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £25.60k £25.60k £6.08k £872 £2.93k
Total expenditure £20.52k £20.17k £3.61k £4.12k £3.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A