RUSTHALL COMMUNITY CINEMA

Charity number: 1171282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 06 April 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 06 April 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 13 October 2018 On time Download