CUMBRIA, NORTHUMBERLAND, TYNE AND WEAR NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITY

Charity number: 1165788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download