CUMBRIA, NORTHUMBERLAND, TYNE AND WEAR NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITY

Charity number: 1165788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £70.00k £39.00k £69.00k £71.00k £330.00k
Total expenditure £178.00k £106.00k £208.00k £162.00k £338.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £185.00k