REALITY CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1167535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time Download