Trustees ENGLISH+

Charity number: 1169790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Revd Canon Andrew Bryant Chair 31 March 2020
FRIENDS OF NORWICH CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Hala Samir Marie Gabra Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Dr ROGER TIMMS Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Priscilla Gavita Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
Natasha Louise Cumberland Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Barbara Hazel Drake Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record