Financial history QE Park Baptist Church

Charity number: 1166680
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £148.06k £162.86k £167.80k £185.00k £99.45k
Total expenditure £129.28k £157.19k £162.84k £187.52k £108.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £28.47k