PENKRIDGE SPORTS & RECREATION CENTRE(MONCKTON)

Charity number: 1165608
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PSRC (Monckton) is the Charitable Incorporated Organisation that overseas and manages the Monckton Recreation Centre. Its aims are the same as the original charity that of providing a facility for the social welfare, recreation, amateur sport and leisure activities with the object of improving the lives of local inhabitants of the Penkridge and Stretton areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £23,911
Total expenditure: £23,347

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 2016: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MONCKTON RECREATION CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GREG YERBURY Trustee 01 May 2022
ROSCOW FOLD ENDOWED SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, PENKRIDGE
Received: On time
Andrew Lenz Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Anthony Minshall Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Andrew Adams Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Richard Lever Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
Mervyn Griffiths Trustee 25 April 2017
THE MONCKTON RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
Dr David Palmer Trustee 18 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £44.47k £41.90k £23.91k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £27.31k £43.82k £23.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 24 February 2025 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 24 February 2025 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 15 July 2024 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 July 2024 200 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 28 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 12 April 2022 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 12 April 2022 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 June 2021 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 09 June 2021 162 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PRSC (Monckton)
Monckton Recreation Centre
Pinfold Lane
Penkridge
Staffordshire
ST19 5QP
Phone:
017855716934