Accounts and annual returns BABY BASICS NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1168449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 October 2018 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2018 115 days late Download Open in new window