Financial history KNOWLE UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 1166099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £135.12k £180.28k £142.03k £143.95k £167.29k
Total expenditure £93.20k £122.58k £117.93k £148.26k £166.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A