Accounts and annual returns WORD OF LIFE CELEBRATIONS CENTRE

Charity number: 1168912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 20 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 20 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 21 February 2020 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 21 February 2020 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 08 January 2020 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 21 February 2020 420 days late Download Open in new window