Financial history WORD OF LIFE CELEBRATIONS CENTRE

Charity number: 1168912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £11.49k £29.59k £43.23k £27.63k £19.44k
Total expenditure £5.04k £4.89k £7.48k £11.82k £11.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A