Accounts and annual returns MEDICAL INFORMATION FOR ETHNIC MINORITIES

Charity number: 1172537
Charity reporting is overdue by 492 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 127 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 127 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 492 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 492 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 13 May 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 13 May 2020 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 January 2020 332 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2020 332 days late Download Open in new window