SAPCOTE COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1167496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 25 June 2018 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 March 2018 On time Download