Financial history AL-HIKMEH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £5.09m £4.43m £2.00m £4.11m £3.43m
Total expenditure £5.07m £4.42m £2.01m £4.11m £3.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.09m £4.43m £1.99m £4.11m £3.43m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £11.01k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.07m £4.42m £2.01m £4.11m £3.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £40 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.86k £0 £9.48k £13.02k £12.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.05m £4.42m £1.90m £4.09m £3.14m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0