TRENDY TEENS

Charity number: 1168011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 14 March 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 14 March 2019 41 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 19 February 2018 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 19 February 2018 18 days late Download