PARTNERSHIPS OVERSEAS NETWORKING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PONT relieves sickness and poverty and promotes and preserves good health in Uganda by provision of funds, goods and services including counseling and support by means of exchange of people, resources and ideas between Rhondda Cynon Taff in Wales and the Mbale, Manafwa and Bududa districts in Uganda. The main activities relate to health, education, orphan support and NGO capacity building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 May 2016: CIO registration
- PONT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Maurice Comissiong | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Gaynor Louise Penrose | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Marga Linda Quince | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Julian Martyn Newton | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Cllr Jayne Brencher | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Richard Griffiths | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
GEOFF LLOYD | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|||||
HOWARD ADRIAN SMITH | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|||||
KATHRYN RICKARDS | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.10k | £167.09k | £479.00k | £365.62k | £295.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.08k | £123.64k | £500.24k | £386.88k | £268.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £270.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 May 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL SPIRITUAL AND SOCIAL) BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF UGANDA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY MEANS OF THE EXCHANGE OF PEOPLE, RESOURCES AND IDEAS BETWEEN THE COMMUNITY OF THE COUNTRY OF RHONDDA CYNON TAF IN SOUTH EAST WALES AND THE COMMUNITY OF MBALE BUDUDA AND MANAFWA DISTRICTS OF EASTERN UGANDA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARTREF
PENCERRIG STREET
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 2HS
- Phone:
- 01443407575
- Email:
- info@pont-mbale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window