READING CHILDREN'S & VOLUNTARY YOUTH SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RCVYS provides Voluntary Sector Infrastructure Support and Training for Voluntary Sector organisations who work with children, young people and families in the Greater Reading area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £28,080 from government contract(s) and £5,100 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- RCVYS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £28.08k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 12 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 12 December 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR WHICH IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND / OR FAMILIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN READING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY: I.LIAISING BETWEEN CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENT AGENCIES AND OTHER GROUPS ON RELEVANT ISSUES; II.PROVIDING TRAINING, CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS ON SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THE EFFICIENCY OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR; III.IDENTIFYING NEEDS IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THEM; IV.ASSISTING IN THE ADMINISTRATION OF FUNDING PROGRAMMES TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, MONITORING FOR GRANTS, RECOMMENDING GRANTS, ASSISTING IN APPLICATIONS FOR GRANTS; V.PROVIDING INFORMATION TO THE PRESS AND THE PUBLIC ON THE OPERATION OF, OR PROBLEMS ENCOUNTERED BY, THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR; VI.PROVIDING SERVICES SUCH AS LEGAL, ACCOUNTANCY AND MANAGEMENT ADVICE SERVICES TO THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR; VII.PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON FUND-RAISING TECHNIQUES APPROPRIATE FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND CHARITIES; VIII.ACTING AS A REPRESENTATIVE OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN RELATION TO GOVERNMENT POLICIES AND LEGISLATION. ‘THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. ·CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. ·VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
IN READING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window