SLOUGH DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1167468
Charity reporting is overdue by 415 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Annual return 09 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 415 days
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 415 days
Annual return 09 December 2018 16 January 2020 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2018 24 January 2020 107 days late Download
Annual return 09 December 2017 27 November 2018 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2017 27 November 2018 49 days late Download
Annual return 09 December 2016 14 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 09 December 2016 09 January 2018 92 days late Download