SLOUGH DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1167468
Charity reporting is overdue by 420 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FATHEYAH MOHAMMED AHMED Trustee 16 March 2016 None on record
Anab Abdulle Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
ABDINASIR DIRIE Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record
MOHAMED YUSUF Trustee 24 January 2016 None on record
AHMED ABDIRAHMAN DEGREE Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record
ZINA SAEED Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record
HAMZE ISMAEL Trustee 25 February 2016 None on record
ABDIRAHMAN OMAR HASSAN Trustee 21 September 2015 None on record
HERSI SALAH Trustee 06 June 2016 None on record