BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION HASTINGS & ROTHER

Charity number: 1166324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 July 2021 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 July 2021 155 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 May 2019 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 May 2019 102 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late Download