BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION HASTINGS & ROTHER

Charity number: 1166324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.52k £0 £956 £2.45k £0
Total expenditure £2.84k £619 £844 £2.26k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A