ALDERHOLT COMMUNITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1167313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £12.51k £13.20k £13 £6.90k £7.00k
Total expenditure £1.89k £12.03k £2.16k £11.51k £9.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A