ST HILARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1165415
Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 476 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 476 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 22 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required