Accounts and annual returns UMOJA STREET CHILD TRUST

Charity number: 1168734
Charity reporting is overdue by 324 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 324 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 324 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 17 July 2019 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 August 2018 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window