Accounts and annual returns ST. MARGARET'S AT CLIFFE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1166921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window