THE FRIENDS OF NORMANTON JUNIOR ACADEMY

Charity number: 1166069
Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Annual return 01 September 2019 23 March 2021 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 04 January 2020 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required