Accounts and annual returns RAMSEY COLTS FOOTBALL DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1166597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 13 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 June 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 17 June 2020 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 May 2019 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 May 2019 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required