Financial history RAMSEY COLTS FOOTBALL DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1166597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £61.90k £556.07k £124.58k £83.40k £97.78k
Total expenditure £71.58k £559.56k £80.54k £73.91k £95.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £18.71k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £545.93k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £5.87k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £4.26k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £45.65k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £9.71k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £504.20k N/A N/A N/A