Financial history EAST SUSSEX ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1165989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £58.81k £47.83k £51.71k £48.57k £48.23k
Total expenditure £52.18k £41.62k £46.77k £44.54k £60.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £16.80k