Financial history JAZZ NORTH-EAST LIMITED

Charity number: 507509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £48.95k £36.49k £28.57k £35.63k £9.70k
Total expenditure £43.40k £38.52k £32.11k £27.66k £8.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.60k N/A N/A £20.14k N/A