BISHOP'S WALTHAM GARDENING CLUB

Charity number: 1169353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 05 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 09 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download