Financial history HOUNSLOW MUSIC SERVICE

Charity number: 1165778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.15m £1.08m £1.19m £1.34m £1.14m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.20m £1.20m £1.29m £1.07m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £372.43k £375.44k £380.07k £392.31k £602.26k
Income - Donations and legacies £378.10k £3.00k £386.90k £447.84k £402.42k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £774.86k £699.77k £803.26k £892.92k £524.29k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £215.54k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £402.42k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.20m £1.20m £1.29m £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.62k £12.22k £12.66k £13.18k £12.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0