Accounts and annual returns SSG SUSTAINABLE LIVING

Charity number: 1167457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 26 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window